California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015