California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 30, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill February 1, 2016
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 18, 2015