LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB62
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB62
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB62
Compare Versions
SB62 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB62 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB62 Amended August 30, 2016
SB62 Amended August 19, 2016
SB62 Amended February 1, 2016
SB62 Amended June 2, 2015
SB62 Amended April 7, 2015
SB62 Amended March 18, 2015
SB62 Introduced December 30, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB62 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB62 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB62 Amended August 30, 2016
SB62 Amended August 19, 2016
SB62 Amended February 1, 2016
SB62 Amended June 2, 2015
SB62 Amended April 7, 2015
SB62 Amended March 18, 2015
SB62 Introduced December 30, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare