California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2015

Amended

Bill July 13, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill May 19, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015