LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB633
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB633
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB633
Compare Versions
SB633 Chaptered September 1, 2015
SB633 Enrolled August 19, 2015
SB633 Amended July 13, 2015
SB633 Amended July 2, 2015
SB633 Amended May 19, 2015
SB633 Amended April 14, 2015
SB633 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB633 Chaptered September 1, 2015
SB633 Enrolled August 19, 2015
SB633 Amended July 13, 2015
SB633 Amended July 2, 2015
SB633 Amended May 19, 2015
SB633 Amended April 14, 2015
SB633 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare