|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 711, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2421.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 825.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|