California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB64 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill June 24, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015