|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 804, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2676.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 3029.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 728.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|