California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB641 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 27, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015