California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB644 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill August 28, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015