LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB644
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB644
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB644
Compare Versions
SB644 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB644 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB644 Amended August 28, 2015
SB644 Amended June 30, 2015
SB644 Amended June 1, 2015
SB644 Amended April 7, 2015
SB644 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB644 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB644 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB644 Amended August 28, 2015
SB644 Amended June 30, 2015
SB644 Amended June 1, 2015
SB644 Amended April 7, 2015
SB644 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare