|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5489.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 19. Page 6236.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5970.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2963.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 651.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|