California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB648 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill January 26, 2016
Bill January 5, 2016
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015