|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1791.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2175.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1030.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 730.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|