California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB651 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2015

Amended

Bill June 23, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015