|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5556.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 6479.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 29). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
August 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5776.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 858.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|