California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB654 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 11, 2016
Bill September 2, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015