California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB655 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015