LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB655
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB655
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB655
Compare Versions
SB655 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB655 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB655 Amended August 17, 2015
SB655 Amended July 7, 2015
SB655 Amended April 14, 2015
SB655 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB655 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB655 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB655 Amended August 17, 2015
SB655 Amended July 7, 2015
SB655 Amended April 14, 2015
SB655 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare