|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 264, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2190.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2527.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 545.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|