California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2015

Amended

Bill June 15, 2015
Bill May 19, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015