|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 770, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5556.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6472.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2916.) (January 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2894.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
March 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|