California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB66 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill January 14, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016