Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
July 13 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1158.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 920.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|