LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB670
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB670
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB670
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 27, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 20, 2015
Compare
Bill
August 18, 2015
Compare
Bill
June 1, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 13, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 23, 2015
Compare