|
09/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 274, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2633.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1025.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 921.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|