California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB672 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill May 13, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015