|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 611, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2754.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 3095.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 859.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|