California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB673 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015