|
09/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 284, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1292.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1147.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|