LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB68
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB68
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB68
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 8, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 27, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 9, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 24, 2015
Compare
Bill
June 2, 2015
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2015
Compare