|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2445.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 2788.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|