LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB682
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB682
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB682
Compare Versions
SB682 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB682 Amended August 31, 2015
SB682 Amended June 24, 2015
SB682 Amended May 5, 2015
SB682 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB682 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB682 Amended August 31, 2015
SB682 Amended June 24, 2015
SB682 Amended May 5, 2015
SB682 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare