California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 28, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015