LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB696
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB696
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB696
Compare Versions
SB696 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB696 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB696 Amended August 28, 2015
SB696 Amended July 16, 2015
SB696 Amended July 2, 2015
SB696 Amended June 29, 2015
SB696 Amended May 5, 2015
SB696 Amended April 14, 2015
SB696 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB696 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB696 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB696 Amended August 28, 2015
SB696 Amended July 16, 2015
SB696 Amended July 2, 2015
SB696 Amended June 29, 2015
SB696 Amended May 5, 2015
SB696 Amended April 14, 2015
SB696 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare