|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2726.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1210.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 596.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|