California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015