|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2425.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1211.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 723.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|