California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB708 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill August 27, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015