|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2275.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 8. Page 2633.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 824.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|