California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015