|
08/26/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 225, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2143.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Assembly Rule 69 suspended. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2521.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 723.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|