LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB725
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB725
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB725
Compare Versions
SB725 Chaptered August 26, 2015
SB725 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SB725 Amended August 20, 2015
SB725 Amended August 18, 2015
SB725 Amended July 7, 2015
SB725 Amended June 2, 2015
SB725 Amended April 28, 2015
SB725 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB725 Chaptered August 26, 2015
SB725 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SB725 Amended August 20, 2015
SB725 Amended August 18, 2015
SB725 Amended July 7, 2015
SB725 Amended June 2, 2015
SB725 Amended April 28, 2015
SB725 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare