|
10/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 580, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2754.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3104.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 726.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|