LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB767
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB767
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB767
Compare Versions
SB767 Chaptered October 7, 2015
SB767 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB767 Amended July 16, 2015
SB767 Amended July 8, 2015
SB767 Amended June 1, 2015
SB767 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB767 Chaptered October 7, 2015
SB767 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB767 Amended July 16, 2015
SB767 Amended July 8, 2015
SB767 Amended June 1, 2015
SB767 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare