|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 478, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5436.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5387.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5905.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 973.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|