California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB777 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill April 6, 2015