|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 587, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2275.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2629.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1024.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 960.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 724.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|