LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB793
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB793
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB793
Compare Versions
SB793 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB793 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB793 Amended June 30, 2015
SB793 Amended May 5, 2015
SB793 Amended April 27, 2015
SB793 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB793 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB793 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB793 Amended June 30, 2015
SB793 Amended May 5, 2015
SB793 Amended April 27, 2015
SB793 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare