California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2015

Amended

Bill July 15, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015